Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Eyk, Victoria Van, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martindale, Eric, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Richard C. Darwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard C. Darwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Without Children |
|
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions189 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time482 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | OFF CALENDAR, COMPLIED WITH CASE RESOLUTION PROGRAM. JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/04/19. | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS MAR-21-2019 | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PUBLICATION OF SAN FRANCISCO CHRONICLE FILED BY PETITIONER EYK, VICTORIA VAN | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT MARTINDALE, ERIC | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST/JUDGMENT RECEIVED RESUBMITTED BY: ATTORNEY | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK REJECT LETTER | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST/JUDGMENT RECEIVED RESUBMITTED BY: ATTORNEY | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK REJECT LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.