Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Nelson, Deborah Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gleason, Nicholas Abbott, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel A. Flores presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A. Flores Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2012 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions981 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1863 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES AMENDED ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 1/9/18 SERVED TO DEBORAH NELSON, CLAUDIA BRAVO SILVERMAN/SILVERMAN & SILVERMAN, NICHOLAS A GLEASON | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 1/3/18 PERSONS SERVED: DEBORAH NELSON, NICHOLAS A GLEASON, CLAUDIA BRAVO SILVERMAN/SILVERMAN & SILVERMAN | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING *AMENDED* HEARD 1/3/2018 FILED BY OTHER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER Modification Of Child Support, Health Care, Order For Uninsured Medical CostsOff Calendar Jan-03-2018 Granted Per Written Order | |
January 03, 2018 | Hearing | NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER Modification Of Child Support, Health Care, Order For Uninsured Medical Costs | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, ORDER FOR UNINSURED MEDICAL COSTS ON JAN-03-2018 - GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-03-2018 08:30 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING HEARD ON 1/3/18 FILED BY OTHER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR SACKLEY, LOUISE AS ATTORNEY FOR NELSON, DEBORAH MICHELLE | |
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR JOYCE, SEAN P. AS ATTORNEY FOR GLEASON, NICHOLAS ABBOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.