Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
County Of San Francisco, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Maximo Jr, Reco Tony, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategorySummons And Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions300 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time302 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 9/11/2018 - PERSON SERVED - MARY WYATT | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS DCSS# 200000002112054 FILED BY PETITIONER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT MAXIMO JR, RECO TONY SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.