Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Childress, Sheila Kay, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Peters, Brien Denae, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Rebecca L. Wightman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca L. Wightman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryUifsa/Responding |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time854 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE ( OUT)- PERSON SERVED - BRIEN DENAE PETERS; SHEILA KAY CHILDRESS; LOGAN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (OUT - SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY) | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS FILED 12/27/2017. PERSONS SERVED: LOGAN COUNTY CSE UNIT | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS FILED 12/27/17 PERSONS SERVED: BRIEN DENAE PETERS, SHEILA KAY CHILDRESS | |
December 27, 2017 | Hearing |
NOTICE OF MOTION FOR CHILD SUPPORT JUDGMENT
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-27-2017 08:30 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR CHILD SUPPORT JUDGMENT ON DEC-27-2017 - GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS HEARD ON 12/27/2017 | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES GENETIC TEST RESULTS- PERSON SERVED- BRIEN DENAE PETERS; SHEILA KAY CHILDRESS | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT IN SUPPORT OF CHILD SUPPORT ACTION DNA TEST REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.