Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Waite, August, Waite, Brian A, Waite, Christina, White, Adelina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nolan, James V, against Primus, Anthony L, represented by Merlo, Teo, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Christine A. Carringer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristine A. Carringer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryMv - Compl.For Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED WAITE, BRIAN A |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLMNT WAITE, BRIAN A |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO PRIMUS, ANTHONY L |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TWO WAITE, BRIAN A |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ONE PRIMUS, ANTHONY L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.