Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Madanat, Nazeeh J, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Michael Mattice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Mattice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2019 |
CategoryCb - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
WRIT ISSUED BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT ISSUED BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
COURT DEFAULT JUDG (UNCONTEST) BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL (PARTY ONLY) BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.