Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Moorehead, Janette M, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with D. Scott Daniels presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeD. Scott Daniels Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2018 |
CategoryCb - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
WRIT FILED BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT ISSUED BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT ISSUED BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
COURT DEFAULT JUDG (UNCONTEST) BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.