Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
E. John Flores, Peachtree Settlement Funding, Llc., filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Michael Mattice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Mattice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WO PRE PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC., |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC., |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
January 14, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights TENTATIVE RULING The court is concerned as to whether the proposed transfer is fair and reasonable and in the best interests o...
Judge: MICHAEL MATTICE |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (NO FEE) PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING, LLC., |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.