Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America, N.A, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobsen, Devin, against Hormigas, Imelda S., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Alesia F. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlesia F. Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT ISSUED BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
COPY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
OVER/SHORT/UNDER $10. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATED JUDGMENT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | RESTORED TO COURT'S CONTROL | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.