Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Miranda, Frank, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Bank Of America N.A, Prlap, Inc, Quality Loan Service Corp., represented by Reidy, David S., in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Robert S. Bowers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Bowers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2011 |
CategoryDo - Complaint For Real Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER BANK OF AMERICA N.A, |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY | |
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER BANK OF AMERICA N.A, |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | HEARD | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
NON-OPPOSITION BANK OF AMERICA N.A, |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) | |
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE (NO FEE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.