Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Minton, James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMinton, James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Minton, James Bruce Hearing Time 10:30 AM Comment CC/CV/return of children filed by Pet(032921) | |
September 02, 2021 | Hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Comment blank declaration form/proof of service. Both documents are incomplete | |
June 22, 2021 | Hearing | Personal Service Served 06/20/2015 | |
June 22, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service of Summons, Comp/Pet and RFO Filed Comment Pet for custody & Support/Summons/UCCJEA/RFO | |
June 22, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY STEPHANIE MICHELLE BUSH RE: CC/CV/OTHER:IMMEDIATE RETURN OF CHILD 032921 | |
June 22, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Slater, Susan F Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY STEPHANIE MICHELLE BUSH RE: CC/CV/OTHER:IMMEDIATE RETURN OF CHILD 032921 | |
June 11, 2021 | Hearing | Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Comment ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING - UNDELIVERABLE | |
April 29, 2021 | Hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed Comment STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED | |
April 29, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Slater, Susan F Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY STEPHANIE MICHELLE BUSH RE: CC/CV/OTHER:IMMEDIATE RETURN OF CHILD 032921 SUSAN F SLATER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: GABRIELA BONILLAS COURT REPORTER NUMIA FATA;12678 BAILIFF: M CHAVEZ - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER STEPHANIE MICHELLE BUSH PRESENT RESPONDENT MICHAEL SAMUEL WILLIAMS JR PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE/ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : COURT FINDS RESPONDENT HAS NOT BEEN SERVED HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PETITIONER. REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/22/21 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V11. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
April 29, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Slater, Susan F Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY STEPHANIE MICHELLE BUSH RE: CC/CV/OTHER:IMMEDIATE RETURN OF CHILD 032921 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.