Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Medeiros, Donald Michael filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Bovee, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBovee, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing Filed | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Received FOAH RE: 2/22/21 |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Attorney Don Mederios is no longer representing petitioner Sara Moretz |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY SARA MORETZ GUY BOVEE,JUDGE CLERK: JOSEPH HERNANADEZ COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: L DILBECK - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION --DISMISSAL LACK OF PROSECUTION (FL) DISPOSITION DISMISSAL LACK OF PROSECUTION (FL) ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY SARA MORETZ GUY BOVEE,JUDGE CLERK: JOSEPH HERNANADEZ COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: L DILBECK - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES COMPLAINT STAGE AT D |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed re: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED BY SARA MORETZ. |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY SARA MORETZ |
|
March 11, 2021 | |||
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY SARA MORETZ GUY BOVEE,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA FLORES COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS;7776 BAILIFF: R POWELL - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SARA MORETZ, RYAN JUSTIN VOGT ATTORNEY DONALD MEDEIROS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY DONALD MEDEIROS FOR ATTORNEY SHARON BRUNNER FOR RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: OSC/MOTION HELD. MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. REASON: FOR POSSIBLE RESOLUTION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/30/21 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT V12. (CONFIRMATION OF SETTLEMENT) VACATE HDV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/11/21 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT V12. COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY SARA MORETZ GUY BOVEE,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA FLORES COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS;7776 BAILIFF: R POWELL - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SARA MORETZ, RYAN JUSTIN VOGT ATTORNEY DONALD MEDEIROS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.