Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Cabrera, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCabrera, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment CHANGE VISITATION FILED BY SARAH MARTINEZ (042021) | |
June 28, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY SARAH MARTINEZ RE: CHANGE VISITATION (042021) | |
June 28, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Hearing Time 10:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY SARAH MARTINEZ RE: CHANGE VISITATION (042021) | |
May 27, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE | |
May 27, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Continuance Filed Comment HRG CONTINUED TO 06/28/21 | |
May 12, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY SARAH MARTINEZ RE: CHANGE VISITATION (042021) CARLOS CABRERA,JUDGE CLERK: GUADALUPE MORA COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO;11855 BAILIFF: C MORRIS - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KYLE WOOLDRIDGE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY KYLE WOOLDRIDGE FOR ATTORNEY TERRY CALDWELL. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SARAH MARTINEZ, MARTYN STODDARD - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY ATTORNEY WOOLDRIDGE. ATTORNEY CALDWELL IS REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE. MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/28/21 AT 10:30 IN DEPARTMENT V14. ALL EXISTING TEMPORARY ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT UNTIL 06/28/21 COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
May 12, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Cabrera, Carlos Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY SARAH MARTINEZ RE: CHANGE VISITATION (042021) | |
April 28, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR ORDER/TEMP ORDRS/UCCJEA/BLNK RESP DEC BY PRSNL SERV ON 04/21/21 AS TO ATTY CALDWELL, FILED. | |
April 28, 2021 | Hearing | Miscellaneous Document Filed Comment SIGNED VERIFICATION FOR DECL OF SARAH MARTINEZ * FILED. (IMAGED) | |
April 20, 2021 | Hearing | Request for Order Filed re: Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY SARAH MARTINEZ RE: CHANGE VISITATION(042021). |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.