Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Assltyne, Nichelle filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Susan F. Slater presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan F. Slater Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: FCS REPORT SUSAN F SLATER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: GABRIELA BONILLAS COURT REPORTER VALERIE FOSTER;9413 BAILIFF: M CHAVEZ - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: NICHELLE ASSLTYNE, RICKY HOLLOWAY III - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. 11:20 NO APPEA |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report Forwarded to Department: CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT: V11 (BOTH-NO SHOW). |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY COURT SERVICES COVERSHEET | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services Re: FAMILY COURT SERVICES: FATHER ONLY-MARCH 12, 2021 @ 1:00PM |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Court Services Re: FAMILY COURT SERVICES: MOTHER ONLY-MARCH 2021 |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS FILE SCANNED | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY NICHELLE ASSLTYNE SUSAN F SLATER,COMMISSIONER CLERK: GABRIELA BONILLAS COURT REPORTER VALERIE FOSTER;9413 BAILIFF: M CHAVEZ - APPEARANCES: PROTECTED PERSON NICHELLE ASSLTYNE PRESENT RESTRAINED PERSON RICKY HOLLOWAY III |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | REFERRAL TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FILED. | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Comment: COPY OF POS PLACED IN CLETS BIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.