Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
County Of San Bernardino, Gomez, Yehimy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support, against Gomez Chavez, J Jesus, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Bovee, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBovee, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions138 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 |
Department B4 - Barstow
Judge: Bovee, Guy |
||
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
December 21, 2023 |
Department B4 - Barstow
Judge: Bovee, Guy |
||
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
August 24, 2023 |
Department B4 - Barstow
Judge: Bovee, Guy |
||
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Former: US Legal Group; New: Pro/Per |
|
August 18, 2023 |
Department B4 - Barstow
Judge: Bovee, Guy |
||
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Remote Appearance Participant to appear in person |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Motion to Be Relieved/Check for $90 received on 8-7-23 is returned because this document was already received on 7-3-23. The 7-3-23 Motion has been processed with a hearing set on 8-18-23. |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.