Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Bednorz, Jill Jeanette, California Public Employees' Retirement System, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bednorz, John Everest, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Natalie S Keller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNatalie S Keller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 |
Department S43 - Historic
Judge: Keller, Natalie S |
||
May 16, 2023 |
Department S43 - Historic
Judge: Keller, Natalie S |
||
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Concerning the Attorney Client Trust Account |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received SUB OF ATTY |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed AS TO dANIEL CARGNELUTTI IS SUBED OUT WITH PRO SE JILL BEDNORZ |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Returning Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel and Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel due to the following: Missing Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (MC053) which is required in filing these documents; please correct and re-submit, thank you! |
|
April 28, 2023 |
Department S43 - Historic
Judge: Keller, Natalie S |
||
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Filed | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Fax Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.