Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Amani, Dina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmani, Dina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment STATUS OF FILING JUDGMENT | |
September 27, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence Judicial Officer Amani, Dina Issam Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment filed by Timothy Dawson (081921) | |
September 07, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed - Granted | |
September 07, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Amani, Dina Issam Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Court's motion Comment FILED BY TIMOTHY DAWSON (081921) | |
August 26, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Amani, Dina Issam Hearing Time 10:30 AM Result Not Held Comment Move Out filed by Lucia Ramirez (042721) | |
August 19, 2021 | Hearing | Temporary Restraining Order Filed - Denied | |
August 19, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing Filed (Domestic Violence Prevention) | |
August 19, 2021 | Hearing | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
August 19, 2021 | Hearing | Subsequent DV Prevention without Minor Children Filed | |
July 21, 2021 | Hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.