Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Agron, Joel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAgron, Joel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2022 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Amani, Dina Issam Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment Domestic Violence Filed By Earl Thomas Jr (050621)/Trial Setting Conference | |
October 25, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed - Granted | |
October 25, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Amani, Dina Issam Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment Filed by Earl Thomas (050621) | |
October 13, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service by Mail (CLETS) Comment ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG | |
October 05, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed | |
October 05, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Amani, Dina Issam Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment filed by Earl Thomas on 05/06/21 | |
October 04, 2021 | Hearing | Request to Continue Hearing (Domestic Violence) Filed | |
September 16, 2021 | Hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Comment Request to continue hearing is being returned for the following reason: Missing the Order on Request to Continue Hearing (DV-116) | |
July 20, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed - Granted | |
July 20, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Amani, Dina Issam Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.