Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
County Of San Bernardino, Portillo, Sandra, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Portillo, William, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Christian Towns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristian Towns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 |
Department S46 - Historic
Judge: Towns, Christian |
||
March 28, 2024 |
Department S49 - Historic
Judge: Joo, Cecilia H |
||
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Referred to Family Court Services. The parties have been advised that the case has been referred to Family Court Services and to cooperate fully with the Child Custody Recommending Counselor during all stages of the mediation/evaluation. Custodial parent(s) shall make children available at all times requested by Counselor. |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Referral to Family Court Services Filed | |
March 12, 2024 |
Department S46 - Historic
Judge: Towns, Christian |
||
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Minute Order 02/06/2024, served by mail |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Minute Order dated 02/06/2024 |
|
February 06, 2024 |
Department S46 - Historic
Judge: Towns, Christian |
||
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice re: Payment of Support Filed (DCSS Added)(FAM) | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Notice Regarding Payment of Support, served by mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.