Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Bennett, Teresa S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBennett, Teresa S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Bennett, Teresa S Hearing Time 10:30 AM Comment CC/CV/CS Filed by Erica Leal (032421) | |
November 02, 2021 | Hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed | |
November 02, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Bennett, Teresa S Hearing Time 10:30 AM Result Continued Court's motion Comment CC/CV/CS Filed by Erica Leal (032421) | |
November 01, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment Request for Order, UCCJEA | |
September 28, 2021 | Hearing | Personal Service Served 09/05/2021 | |
September 28, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed Comment By personal; Summons, Petition, UCCJEA, Attachments | |
September 28, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service (CLETS) Comment DV-116 | |
September 28, 2021 | Hearing | Restraining Order After Hearing Filed-Granted | |
September 28, 2021 | Hearing | This order shall expire at midnight on Comment 9/28/2024 | |
September 28, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Bennett, Teresa S Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment CC/CV/CS Filed by Erica Leal (032421) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.