Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Burdick, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBurdick, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2022 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Burdick, John Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment (Ptnr filed 11-2-21) Change CC/CV | |
November 30, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed | |
November 30, 2021 | Hearing | Request For Order Re: View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Burdick, John Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment to change child custody and visitation | |
November 02, 2021 | Hearing | Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders Filed Comment (DENIED) | |
November 02, 2021 | Hearing | Request for Order (Exparte) Filed re: Comment to change child custody and visitation | |
November 02, 2021 | Hearing | Ex Parte Hearing View Document **FL - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Burdick, John Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Not Held Comment CHange CC/CV | |
October 29, 2021 | Hearing | Decl Re Ntc & Srvc of Request for Temp Emergency Order filed | |
October 29, 2021 | Hearing | Declaration Under UCCJEA filed | |
October 29, 2021 | Hearing | ExParte Request for Ordr Recd & Set for Hrg re: Mod CC or CV Comment Change: CC/CV | |
October 15, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.