Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford, Bradley S, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Richter, Katherine, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Cristina Mazzei presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCristina Mazzei Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney as to | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability of Counsel | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney as to | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Mazzei, Cristina |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of DV-109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING, DV-110 DENIED, DV-100, ETC |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | DV-TRO Ex Parte Cover Sheet | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Denied |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.