Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Botto, Mark Spiro, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Botto, Adriana Marie, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Hugo R. Borja presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHugo R. Borja Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 03, 2017 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time23 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Court Ordered | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Borja, Hugo R. |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of Response to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of DV-109 with DV-140 and a blank DV-120 (Notice of Court Hearing; Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order; blank Response to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order) |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.