Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lima Sara, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Cooper Robert, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Robert P. Applegate presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert P. Applegate Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Harassment (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court-Petition Denied |
Case Cycle Time31 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2013 | Hearing |
Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator |
|
March 22, 2013 | Hearing |
Statement-Non-Agreement (FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT FILED BY MEDIATOR. MEDIATION WAS HELD ON 3/22/13 AND LASTED A TOTAL OF .45. THE MEDIATION ENDED IN NONAGREEMENT. ) Filed by Mediator |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department ADR, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR - Non-Agreement Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department BUR3, Robert P. Applegate, Presiding Order to Show Cause - TRO dism-after evid. by both sides Judge: Robert P. Applegate |
|
February 28, 2013 | Hearing |
Proof of Service by Moving Party Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 27, 2013 | Hearing |
Response to Harrassment Petition Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 22, 2013 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 19, 2013 | Hearing |
Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Court |
|
February 19, 2013 | Hearing |
Order for TRO Filed by Plaintiff |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Req for Order for TRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.