Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wagner Kristin, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Mueller Cara, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Donna Fields Goldstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna Fields Goldstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2011 |
CategoryCivil Harassment (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDism Lack Of Prosecution-Petn O/C |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department NCBB, Donna Fields Goldstein, Presiding OSC and Temp. Restraining Order (CROSS PETITION ONLY REMAINING) - TRO dism-lack of prosecution Judge: Donna Fields Goldstein |
|
July 22, 2011 | Hearing |
Restraining Order (reissuance ) Filed by Court |
|
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department NCBB, Donna Fields Goldstein, Presiding OSC and Temp. Restraining Order - Matter is continued/TRO ffe Judge: Donna Fields Goldstein |
|
July 21, 2011 | Hearing |
Declaration (of John Fu, Esq. re July 22, 2011 ) Filed by Former Attorney for Defendant |
|
July 21, 2011 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Former Attorney for Defendant |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department NCBB, Donna Fields Goldstein, Presiding OSC and Temp. Restraining Order ((proof of service on file)) - Matter is continued/TRO ffe Judge: Donna Fields Goldstein |
|
July 08, 2011 | Hearing |
Answer Filed by Defendant |
|
July 08, 2011 | Hearing |
Restraining Order (Reissuance ) Filed by Court |
|
July 07, 2011 | Hearing |
Req for Order for TRO (Cross Petition ) Filed by Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.