Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael & Associates, Slinsky Lourdes R., against Louie Kelvin Aka Kelvin J Louie, Plaza Liquor Mart A California Corp., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Donna Fields Goldstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna Fields Goldstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management175 days |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2017 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time395 days |
Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Publication Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Order for Publication; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Default entered as to Kelvin Louie; On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB on
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: October 03, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Application Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Writ - Return ((Orange)) Filed by Sheriff/Police
Date: August 23, 2022Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Order for Publication Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Application Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: October 03, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Order for Publication
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Summons Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Court
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Court
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.