Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cisneros Malcolm, against Bank Of America A National Association, County Of Los Angeles A Govt. Entity, Discover Bank A Corporation, Easley Jacqueline C., Easley Jerry D, (total of 9) See All represented by Koshki Joshua, Wickham Mary C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with John J. Kralik presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn J. Kralik Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management165 days |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - After Court Trial |
Case Cycle Time659 days |
Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Statement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by:
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Declaration of non-military status; Filed by: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment; Filed by: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Order Court's Order re: Motion for Amendment of Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment -
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Order - ORDER COURT'S ORDER RE: MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Masoud Koshki (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Summons Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Court
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Disclaimer Filed by County of Los Angeles, a govt. entity (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Court
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Statement Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Masoud Koshki (Defendant)
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Judgment (PROPOSED AMENDED) Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (of non-military status) Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: August 22, 2022Declaration Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Order (Court's Order re: Motion for Amendment of Judgment) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Application (for entry of final judgment) Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Request (for court judgment) Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Document:Disclaimer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause re: Submission of Default Judgment packag...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Nicolas Matayron in support of attorney's fees, costs and disbursements)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Disclaimer
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Application (for entry of final judgment)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of non-military status)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Statement
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Request (for court judgment)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF NICOLAS MATAYRON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] AMENDED JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/06/2020)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Declaration (of plaintiff in support of application for final judgment)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause re: Submission of Default Judgment packag...))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/08/2020)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Nicolas Matayron in Support of Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.