Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bosick, Deborah Cherine filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryElder/Adult Dependent Abuse |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2021 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Reichert, Stanford E |
||
June 18, 2021 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Reichert, Stanford E |
||
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified - Registered Interpreter | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Dismissed without prejudice |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER STANFORD E. REICHERT,JUDGE CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON;7137 COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER DEBORAH CHERINE BOSICK PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD NO SERVICE. HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PETITIONER. - RESTRAINING ORDERS THERE ARE NOT CURRENTLY ANY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS IN PLACE IN THIS MATTER. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/18/21 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S35P. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PROOF OF UNSUCCESSFULL SERVICE AS TO RICK PELAYO FILED. |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED. |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing - Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse NOTICE OF COURT HEARING - ELDER OF DEPENDENT ADULTABUSE |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes EX PARTE HEARING REGARDING ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE MICHELLE GILLEECE,JUDGE CLERK: SHANNON PRATT NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT G TREIHART - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER DEBORAH CHERINE BOSICK PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICK PELAYO - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. ACTION CAME ON FOR EX PARTE TEMPORARY ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER. THE COURT HAS REVIEWED THIS PETITION. - COURT FINDS: EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED. NO EMERGENCY - SET FOR HEARING ONLY ALLEGATIONS IN REQUEST DO NOT MEET THE STATUTORY DEFINITION OF ELDER ABUSE. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER SET FOR 03/19/21 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S35P. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.