Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Strong, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail 10/10/16 to Annette M Wright and Christina J Norton, Minutes and Order |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification Child Support; Health Care; Join Other Parent as Party to Action Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS of 10/4/2016 hearing. Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail on 08/26/16 as to Defendant Re: Notice of Motion; Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail on 08/26/16 as to Annette M Wright Re: Notice of Motion; Responsive Declaration to Request for Order; Blank Income & Expense Declaration |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | RFO-OSC-MTN - Modification (DCSS Only) | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail as to Resp & Christina Norton - Minutes and Order filed 05/17/2016 |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial *Jmt: C/S & H/C* Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS DCSS Minute Order/Judgment Date: 5/17/16 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.