Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portillo, Aquilino Meneleo filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time2441 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Hearing - Post disposition Petitioner Filed 7-13-2021 Regarding Contempt Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Order to Show Cause re Contempt | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Responsive Declaration as to Respondent | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Responsive Declaration as to Petitioner | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re Contempt - Party
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Fee Waiver - Granted | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.