Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Leonard D. Goldkind presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D. Goldkind Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL AS TO PADAO LEE VU RE: NTC PAYMT OF SUPPORT-SUBST PAYEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL AS TO [R] RE: NTC REGARDING PAYMT OF SUPPORT-SUBST OF PAYEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SUB OF PAYEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HON. LEONARD GOLDKIND; COMMISSIONER (B14) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [D] MTN: JUDICIAL REVIEW OF LICENSE Desc2: DENIAL Desc3: FILED 4/17/14 Disp Code: 110 - DENIED Disp Clerk: JDW Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DCSS RSP DEC TO REQ FOR ORDER BLNK INCM & XPNS DCL AS TO H YANG Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DCSS RESP DECL TO REQ FOR ORDER BLNK INCM & XPNS DCL AS TO P VU Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee [D] MTN: JUDICIAL REVIEW OF LICENSE DENIAL Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: MMH 493 - $60.00 |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC RE PYMT OF SUPT & NTC OF REG OF OUT OF STATE SUPT ORD MAILED 12/23/13 TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.