Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Acosta, Kelly, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Pro Per, against Schwartz, John, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR [P] FILED BY ATTY NORMAN RYKER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS] MTN: DETERMINE/SET ARREARS & Desc2: ORDER REPAYMENT FLD 5/22/14 Desc3: *1HR SPECIAL SET* Disp Code: 364 - SETTLED/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT OF 09/18/14 HRG HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION BY THE PETNR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF DCSS RE: AUDIT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT OF 6/24/14 HRG HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN: DETERMINE/SET ARREARS & ORDER Desc2: REPAYMENT Desc3: FILED 5/22/14 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR SPEC SET 9/18/14 Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: NPA Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER BY THE PETNR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN FILED BY AS TO NORMAN RYKER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee [DCSS] MOTION: TO DETERMINE & SET ARREARS AND ORDER REPAYMENT Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: NPA 493 - $60.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.