Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Contra Costa, County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mays, Kenneth Darnell, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER - CONTRA COSTA # F10-01701 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CHANGE OF RESPONSIBILITY FOR MANAGING CHILD SUPPORT CASE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COURT ORDER FILED 3/26/13 AS TO [R] AND [O/P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HRG DATE OF 03/26/13 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS]NTC OF MTN: MOD C/S, H/C, OTHER Desc2: FILED 2/27/13 Disp Code: 340 - ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: BLG Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN, BLNK I&E DECL, BLNK RESPONSVE DECL TO KENNETH DARNELL MAYS III Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BLG |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN, BLNK I&E DECL, BLANK RESPONSIVE DECL TO TYONA R HINES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BLG |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee [DCSS] NTC OF MTN: MOD C/S, H/C, ARREAR PAYMNTS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: BLG 495 - $60.00 |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF STATEMNT FOR REGIS OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER TO KENNETH DARNELL MAYS III Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BLG |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF STATEMENT FOR REGIS OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER TO TYONA R HINES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BLG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.