Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Reaster, Scott E, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions275 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time3829 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail on 6/13/17 as to Respondent Re: Notice Re: Payment of Support - Substitution of Payee |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice re Payment of Support Substitution of Payee |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING MIN & ORDER S REASTER & K SMITH Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT OF HEARING DATE OF 2/17/15 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MODIFICATION RE C/S Desc2: FILED 1/12/15 Disp Code: 340 - ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: LGB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee DCSS MOTION FOR MODIFICATION RE C/S Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: LGB 493 - $60.00 |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL 1/9/15 AS TO [D] RE NTC OF MTN, RESPONSIVE DECL TO RFO, AND BLANK I&E Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LGB |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL 1/9/15 AS TO [OP] RE NTC OF MTN AND RESPONSIVE DECL TO RFO Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LGB |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTESAND ORDER FILED 01/08/11 AS TO TAMARA HUTCHESON BY MAIL 2/8/11 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTES & ORDER FILED 1/18/11 AS TO [R] BY MAIL 2/8/11 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.