Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Osborne, Kimberly S, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2003 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time3100 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF ORDER FLD 06/05/12 AS TO ROBERT BESGROVE 6/13/12 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER- FAMILY SUPPORT HRG 6/5/12 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCCS] MTN: C/S, H/C Desc2: FLD 2/29/12 Desc3: -CONT'D Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL (OF CRT ORDER FLD 04/17/12, NTC OF CONT TO 06/05/12)(TO ROBERT BESGROVE) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER- FAMILY SUPPORT HRG 4/17/12 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN: MOD C/S, H/C Desc2: FILED 2/29/12 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG 6/5/12 Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Initial (DCSS Only) DCSS MTN: MOD C/S, H/C Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: SAT 495 - $40.00 |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF MTN AS TO ROBERT BESGROVE 2/28/12 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF MTN AS TO KIMBERLY S DEEDS 2/28/12 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (SUTTER) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: MJO 43 - $7.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.