Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Babb, Christie, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Partida, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2003 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTES AND ORDER FILED 4/15/14 AS TO [D] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S, H/D, OTHER Desc2: FILED 2/25/14 Disp Code: 125 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: JDW Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF MTN, BLNK RESP, ETC BY MAIL 2/25/14 AS TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee [DCSS] MTN: MOD OF C/S, H/C, OTHER Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: JLV 493 - $60.00 |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF MTN, RESP DEC, BY MAIL 2/25/14 AS TO [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV | |
January 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC OF MTN AS TO CHRISTIE BABB 01/05/04 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CAS |
|
January 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC OF MTN AS TO DANIEL PARTIDA 01/05/04 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CAS |
|
December 24, 2003 | Docket Event |
Statement of Rights NTC OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KS |
|
December 24, 2003 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER & CLERK'S NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.