Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shasta, County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Taylor, Frederick George, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2003 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information Custody Status: OR |
|
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [DCSS] OSC: CONTEMT FILED 3/20/08 Desc2: *ADMIT/DENY* Desc3: STATUS OF 270 CASE Disp Code: 331 - CONTEMPT DISMISSED/PD RELIEVED Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: SLG Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [DCSS] OSC: CONTEMPT FILED 3/20/08 Desc2: *ADMIT/DENY* Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG 11/4/08 Disp Clerk: SLG Filing Clerk: JAR Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S FILED 6/5/08 Desc2: CONT FROM 8/26/08 FOR RECEIPT OF LETTER Desc3: RE: TRIBAL PAYMENTS Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART/OFF CALENDAR Disp Clerk: CRW Filing Clerk: CRW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN RE: MOD OF C/S FILED 6/5/08 Desc2: CONT FROM 8/12/08 FOR RECEIPT OF LETTER Desc3: RE: TRIBAL PAYMENTS Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 9/30/08 Disp Clerk: CRW Filing Clerk: CRW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Desc2: *FILED 06/05/08* Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART/CONT TO 8/26/08 Disp Clerk: CRW Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [DCSS] OSC: CONTEMPT FILED 3/20/08 Desc2: *ADMIT/DENY* Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT TO 10/28/08 1:45 PM Disp Clerk: JAR Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Temporary Judge STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO SIT AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE (DAVID E GUNN) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [DCSS] OSC: CONTEMPT Desc2: *FILED 03/20/08* Desc3: 1ST REISSUANCE Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/PD APPT'D/CONT'D TO 6/23/08 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Public Defender Appointed D FORLAND FOR DEFT: PD COUNSEL APPOINTED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.