Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Solano, County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Gilmore, Jeffrey M, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2003 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTES AND ORDER AS TO [D] MAILED 5/13/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [DCSS] NTC OF MTN RE: MOD OF C/S Desc2: FILED 3/14/08 Disp Code: 399 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TLC Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC OF MTN AS TO [O/P] BY MAIL 3/25/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC OF MTN AS TO THE [R] BY MAIL 3/25/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NOTICE OF MOTION RE: MOD OF C/S FILED BY DCSS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: TLC 495 - $40.00 |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS NTC RE PYMT & STMNT FOR REGISTRATION FILED AS TO JEFFREY GILMORE 1/27/04 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CAS |
|
February 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED *BUTTE, SOLANO* Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 14.00 Entry Clerk: KLM 43 - $14.00 |
|
January 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Statement of Rights NTC OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLM |
|
December 05, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (FC4200) (FORMER APP & ORD TO PAY THRU DCSS/BCFTF) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.