Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Napa, County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Crenshaw, Teddy Ray, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2003 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S & CONSOLIDATION Desc2: *FILED 4-10-06* Disp Code: 374 - STIPULATION ENTERED--OFF CAL Disp Clerk: LLM Filing Clerk: LLM Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP & ORDER: MODIFY CHILD/FAMILY SUPPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN FOR 5-2-06 ON TED CRENSHAW & MANDY LYNN HUGHES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NTC OF MTN FILED BY DCSS FOR MOD OF C/S & CONSOLIDATION Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: LLM 495 - $40.00 |
|
February 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED BUTTE (1) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: SAT 43 - $7.00 |
|
December 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (FC4200) (FORMER APP & ORD TO PAY THRU DCSS/BCFTF) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
December 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
Statement of Rights NTC OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
December 09, 2003 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER & CLERK'S NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.