Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, James Harlow, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Davis, Linda Corrine, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2002 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: CASE TO BE HEARD W/DFL000297 Disp Code: 399 - ORDERS MADE IN DFL000297 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: LLM Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN ON JAMES DAVIS & LINDA DAVIS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM |
|
November 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: DCSS OSC: CONTEMPT Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR PER DCSS MEMO Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: DAB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information OFF CALENDAR MEMO RECEIVED FROM DCSS FOR HRNG DATE 11/08/04 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
August 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee OSC RE: CONTEMPT FILED BY DCSS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 36.30 Entry Clerk: DAB 40 - $14.00 260 - $9.00 280 - $3.30 297 - $10.00 |
|
August 06, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB | |
May 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED BUTTE; KINGS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 14.00 Entry Clerk: SMF 43 - $14.00 |
|
January 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF 4200-NTC RE PYMT & STMT FOR REGS FILED 12/27/02 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
December 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
Statement of Rights NTC OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DSG |
|
December 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE: PMT OF SUPPORT,NTC OF ASSIGNED SUPPORT, SUB OF PAYEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DSG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.