Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Sypnicki, Chandra May, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2002 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions270 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time4592 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF REGISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER SHASTA COUNTY CASE # 30777 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: DCSS OSC: CONTEMPT Desc2: FILED 2/18/09 Disp Code: 395 - WITHDRAWN BY DCSS Disp Clerk: SLG Filing Clerk: CRW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Commissioner-Judge Pro Tem STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO SIT AS JUDGE PRO TEM - CC GUNN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued DCSS OSC: CONTEMPT HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: CRW 495 - $40.00 |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event | JUVENILE CUSTODY ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR | |
April 19, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING HRG 4-19-05 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT | |
April 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD: C/S, W/A, DET/SET Desc2: ARRS & ORDER REPMT FILED 1/27/05 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN ON CHANDRA MAY SYPNICKI AND DANIEL WILLIAM SYPNICKI Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NTC OF MTN BY DCSS FOR: MOD C/S, W/A, DET/SET ARRS & ORDER REPMT Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 36.30 Entry Clerk: ARE 40 - $14.00 260 - $9.00 280 - $3.30 297 - $10.00 |
|
September 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CHILD SUPPORT (DEFAULT) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DSG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.