Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Welch, Robin Allen, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time4700 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC RE PYMNT OF SUPPORT SUB OF PAYEE 10-30-14 AS TO [D] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC RE PYMNT OF SUPPORT SUB OF PAYEE 10-30-14 AS TO [O/P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUB OF PAYEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF STIP & ORDER AS TO [R] BY MAIL 1/28/11 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF STIP & ORDER AS TO [OP] BY MAIL 1/28/11 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP & ORDER FILED BY DCSS HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: TLC 494 - $20.00 |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: DCSS OSC: CONTEMPT Desc2: FILED 3/25/09 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR PER DCSS SUBJECT TO REISSUE Disp Clerk: JAR Filing Clerk: CRW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued DCSS OSC: CONTEMPT HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: CRW 495 - $40.00 |
|
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTES AND ORDER AS TO [D] AND [OP] MAILED 4/23/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S & H/C Desc2: *FILED 03/28/08* Disp Code: 399 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.