Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
San Diego, County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Larson, Keith Edward, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2001 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL (MINUTES & ORDER FILED 3/11/08) AS TO KEITH E LARSON 4/07/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Desc2: *FILED 01/15/08* Disp Code: 399 - ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TLC Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE NTC OF MOTION SERVED ON THE [R] BY MAIL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE NTC OF MOTION SERVED ON THE O/P BY MAIL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NOTICE OF MOTION RE: MOD OF C/S FILED BY DCSS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: TLC 495 - $40.00 |
|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF APP & ORDER TO PAY THRU FTF, STMT OF REGIS AS TO RESP Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMD |
|
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED SAN DIEGO Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 1 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: MMD 40 - $7.00 |
|
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice APP & ORDER TO PAY THRU FTF & APPT DCSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMD |
|
December 11, 2001 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER & CLERK'S NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.