Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Woodruff, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time2447 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF REGISTRATION OF CALIF SPPRT ORDER RCVD FROM AMADOR COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
|
May 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP & ORDER: MODIFY CHILD/FAMILY SUPPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM |
|
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MATTHEW WOODRUFF AND SARAH CHRISTENSEN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER/JUDGMENT - FAMILY SUPPORT OF 3/15/05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD: C/S, W/A, 1/2 CC Desc2: FILED 1/03/05 Disp Code: 378 - C/S SET; ARR'S PYT CONFIRMED Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED *BUTTE* Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: KKA 43 - $7.00 |
|
January 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN FOR MATTHEW WOODRUFF AND SARAH ASHLEY CHRISTENSEN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NTC OF MTN BY DCSS FOR: MOD C/S, W/A, 1/2 CC Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 36.30 Entry Clerk: ARE 40 - $14.00 260 - $9.00 280 - $3.30 297 - $10.00 |
|
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATION AND JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
January 06, 2004 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.