Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Byrd, Eric Lane, Sr., in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time2552 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTES AND ORDER AS TO [D] MAILED 12/4/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
December 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Desc2: FILED 10/16/08 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: CRW Filing Clerk: CRW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
December 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF DCSS MOTION AS TO [D] MAILED 10/21/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF DCSS MOTION AS TO [OP] MAILED 10/21/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) DCSS MOTION TO MOD C/S Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: CRW 495 - $40.00 |
|
May 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED BUTTE, HUMBOLDT Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 14.00 Entry Clerk: JDW 43 - $14.00 |
|
October 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF SUPP; H/C; W/A Desc2: ** COURT CALL AUTHORIZED ** Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: SMF Filing Clerk: SMF Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER/JUDGMENT - FAMILY SUPPORT OF CC GUNN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SMF |
|
September 02, 2003 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF SUPP, H/C, W/A Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 10/7/03 AT 1:30 P.M. Disp Clerk: SMF Filing Clerk: JDW Judge: Gunn, David E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.