Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Johnson, William Hector, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions230 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER- FAMILY SUPPORT HRG 8/21/12 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [R] MTN: SET ASIDE JMT OF PATERNITY Desc2: FLD 3/27/12 Desc3: -CONT'D FOR MOTHERS APPEARANCE Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING AS TO JEANETTE HUGHES OF THE FL-692,FL-272,FL-192,FL-273,MC-030 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER- FAMILY SUPPORT HRG 6/19/12 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: [R] MTN: SET ASIDE JMT OF PATERNITY Desc2: FILED: 03/27/12 Desc3: *CONT FOR PROPER SERVICE ON MOM* Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG 8/21/12 Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE COURT ORDER SERVED ON THE O/P Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HRG: 05/08/12 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: [R] MTN: SET ASIDE JMT OF PATERNITY Desc2: FILED 03/27/12 Disp Code: 342 - CONT TO 06/19/12 Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration RESP DECL TO OSC/NTC OF MOTION BY DCSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE RESPONSIVE DECLARATION SERVED ON THE O/P Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.