Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Covington, Ronald Lee, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions573 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time5616 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service By Mail as to [R] & [O/P] re: Minutes & Order filed 05/12/16 |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS DCSS Minute Order Date: 5/10/16 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification Mod of C/S; H/C Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service By Mail as to [R] & [O/P] Re: Minutes & Order filed 04/19/16, Ntc of Crt Date 05/10/16 |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service By Mail as to [R] & [O/P] Re: Ntc of Crt Date 05/10/16 |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS Family law support hearing date of 4/19/2016. Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification filed by DCSS on 3/15/16 re: mod c/s, h/c Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail of notice of motion filed by DCSS as to respondent |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail of notice of motion filed by DCSS as to other parent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.