Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Vasquez, Jon Abraham, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions587 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING MIN/ORD J VASQUEZ D HILDRETH Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT OF HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (C10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS NTC OF OPPOSITION AND NTC OF MTN Desc2: ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION Desc3: FILED 7/6/15 Disp Code: 110 - CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DENIED Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: KKA Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL 7/2/15 AS TO O/P RE: NTC OF OPP & NTC OF MTN ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee DCSS' NTC OF OPPOSITION AND NTC OF MTN ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: KKA 493 - $60.00 |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL 7/2/15 AS TO JON A VASQUEZ RE: NTC OF OPP & NTC OF MTN ON CLAIM OF EXEMP Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL 5/29/15 AS TO [D], [OP] RE MINUTES AND ORDER FILED 5/26/15 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLR |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MODIFICATION RE C/S, Desc2: SET PAYMENT ON ARREARS Desc3: FILED 4/22/2015 Disp Code: 340 - ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: SLR Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT OF HRG DATE OF 05/26/15 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (C10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL 4/21/15 AS TO [OP] RE NTC OF MOTION RESPONSIVE DECL TO RFO, I&E DECL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.