Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Smith, William Guy, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions109 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time4453 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COURT ORDER FILED 2/26/13 AS TO ALL PARTIES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT OF 2/26/13 HRG HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN: MOD C/S, H/C, OTHER-MOD PYT Desc2: ON ARREARS FILED 1/28/13 Disp Code: 125 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: JDW Filing Clerk: JDW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY DCSS AS TO WILLIAM G SMITH Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY DCSS AS TO CYNTHIA MCCLELLAN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee [DCSS] MOTION: MOD C/S, H/C, OTHER-MODIFY PAYMENT ON ARREARS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: JDW 495 - $60.00 |
|
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event | JUVENILE CUSTODY ORDER HON. TAMARA MOSBARGER; JUDGE (B16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB | |
October 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP & ORDER ... Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
April 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CHILD SUPPORT (DEFAULT) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SEG |
|
April 09, 2001 | Docket Event |
Judgment Default Entered for Parentage, Support & Reimburse JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT ENTERED FOR PATERNITY SUPPORT AND REIMBURSEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.