Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Crenshaw, Ted Ray, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William P. Barry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam P. Barry Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions191 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time2241 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING HRG 2-07-07 HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: MODIFICATION OF VISITN Desc2: FILED 1/08/07 Disp Code: 301 - AGREEMENT VIA MEDIATION Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC, BALNK RESPONSE AS TO TED RAY CRENSHAW Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Family Law RFO Mod Custody or Visitation OSC TO MOD VISIT *PP H/D* HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: CA Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 560657 Fee Amount: 65.00 Entry Clerk: LLM 495 - $40.00 496 - $25.00 |
|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING OF 10/5/06 HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LXW |
|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [OP] OSC: MOD VISITN *NO TEMPS* Desc2: *FILED 9/7/06* *OST DENIED* Disp Code: 342 - HEARD-ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: LXW Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR OTHER PARENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OSC, APP FOR ORDER, SUPP DECL & BLANK RESP DECL IN PERSON 9/11/06 AS TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARR |
|
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Family Law RFO Mod Custody or Visitation [OP] OSC RE:MOD OF VISITATION *OST DENIED* *NO TEMPS* *HD* HON. STEVEN R MCNELIS, JUDGE (BSM) Fee Type: CA Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 549294 Fee Amount: 65.00 Entry Clerk: DLB 495 - $40.00 496 - $25.00 |
|
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF MANDY HUGHS (OTHER PARENT) [X]RE NTC OF EXPARTE APP FOR ORDERS (RULE16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.